Greathouse v. Ibrahim
Plaintiff: Bradley Greathouse
Defendant: Shadi Ibrahim
Case Number: 3:2019cv00577
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Motion #10 granted. The initial case management conference is continued to October 15, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/27/2019. (mg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference Date by Bradley Greathouse. (Winfrey, Brian)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Bradley Greathouse. Shadi Ibrahim served on 7/19/2019. (Winfrey, Brian)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENT TO #7 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re Annotation - Deficiency Notice, by Bradley Greathouse. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Winfrey, Brian) Modified on 7/31/2019 (mg). Modified on 8/27/2019 (mg).
July 23, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (mg)
July 23, 2019 FL State Bar status verified as active for C. Ryan Morgan. (mg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney C. Ryan Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2953813) by Bradley Greathouse. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Winfrey, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL C. Ryan Morgan: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/31/2019. (mg)
July 10, 2019 FL State Bar status verified as active for C. Ryan Morgan. (mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Shadi Ibrahim. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shadi Ibrahim (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2948762), filed by Bradley Greathouse. (Attachments: #1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Consent to Join)(mg) Modified on 7/10/2019 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greathouse v. Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Greathouse
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: Brian C. Winfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadi Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?