Blochinger v. Chronicle Books, LLC
Plaintiff: Will Blochinger
Defendant: Chronicle Books, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00578
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #12 Order Dismissing Case (jw)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This case is DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/23/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Will Blochinger. (Peppe, Vincent)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chronicle Books, LLC answer due 9/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/1/2019. (jw)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Chronicle Books, LLC. (Bradford, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT #34675055533 in the amount of $400 re #1 Complaint. (jw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Chronicle Books, LLC. Summons issued and returned to counsel at intake. (jw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
July 11, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Vincent H. Peppe. (jw)
July 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Disregard DE #2 - entered in error. (jw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD - ENTERED in ERROR*** ORDER (jw) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jw).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chronicle Books, LLC, filed by Will Blochinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Photograph, #3 Exhibit B - High Times Magazine Cover, #4 Exhibit C - Invoice and Contract, #5 Exhibit D - Photograph Used Under "Stoner Celebrity Favorite", #6 Exhibit E - United States Copyright Office Certificate of Registration)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blochinger v. Chronicle Books, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chronicle Books, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Blochinger
Represented By: Vincent H. Peppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?