Medina-Delgado v. DAL Global Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wanda I. Medina-Delgado
Defendant: Delta Global Services, Inc., Jeff l/n/u and DAL Global Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00582
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Reopening My Case #3:19-cv-00582. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/6/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Reopening My Case #3:19-cv-0582 by Wanda I. Medina-Delgado. (am)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Sapna Jain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Robert Capobianco to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 20, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (GA) Robert W. Capobianco, (TN) David Andrew Hughes, (GA) Sapna K. Jain. (am)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Sapna Jain to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2974652) by DAL Global Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Jain, Sapna)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Robert Capobianco to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2974637) by DAL Global Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Capobianco, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by DAL Global Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Hughes, David)
August 14, 2019 DISREGARD DE: 7 , FILED IN ERROR. (am)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 **DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR** MOTION for attorney Robert Capobianco to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2971578) by DAL Global Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Capobianco, Robert) Modified on 8/14/2019 (am).
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed DAL Global Services, Inc. served on 7/31/2019. (am)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to DAL Global Services, Inc. (Service packets sent to USMS to effect service.) (am)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff Wanda Medina Delgado's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. No. 6) is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). The claim against Mr. Jeff is therefore DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to ISSUE PROCESS to DAL Global Services through its agent for service of process in Tennessee, Corporation Service Company, 2908 Poston Ave., Nashville, TN 37203-1312, and to ensure service upon the defendant in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, regarding required initial discovery disclosures, shall not apply. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/25/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (am)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Wanda I. Medina-Delgado. (am)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delta Global Services, Inc., Jeff l/n/u, filed by Wanda I. Medina-Delgado.(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina-Delgado v. DAL Global Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Global Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff l/n/u
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAL Global Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sapna K. Jain
Represented By: David Andrew Hughes
Represented By: Robert W. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda I. Medina-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?