Columbia National Insurance Co. v. Icon In The Gulch, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Columbia National Insurance Co.
Defendant: Bristol Development Group, LLC
Counter Plaintiff: Icon In The Gulch, LLC and Icon in the Gulch Master Condominium Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00586
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Bristol Development Group, LLC.(Rowlett, George)
September 6, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Icon In The Gulch, LLC.(McConnell, Vic)
September 6, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Columbia National Insurance Co. by Icon In The Gulch, LLC.(McConnell, Vic)
September 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for George Andrew Rowlett. (mg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, by Columbia National Insurance Co. (Blair, Rebecca) Modified on 9/5/2019 (mg).
September 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by George Andrew Rowlett on behalf of Bristol Development Group, LLC (Rowlett, George)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim and Cross-Claim. Extension to 9/6/19. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/20/19. (af)
August 20, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Icon In The Gulch, LLC. (McConnell, Vic)
August 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/21/2019 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/15/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Icon in the Gulch Master Condominium Association, Inc.. (Panther, Todd)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. W. Carl Spining relieving R. Mark Donnell, Jr. and Robert J. Mendes. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Icon In The Gulch, LLC. (McConnell, Vic)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Extension to 9/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/6/2019. (mg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Icon In The Gulch, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against Columbia National Insurance Co. by Icon in the Gulch Master Condominium Association, Inc. (Panther, Todd) Modified on 8/6/2019 (mg).
August 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Vic L. McConnell. (mg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Icon In The Gulch, LLC. (McConnell, Vic) Modified on 8/6/2019 (mg).
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Vic L. McConnell on behalf of Icon In The Gulch, LLC (McConnell, Vic)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Carl Spining on behalf of Bristol Development Group, LLC (Spining, W.)
August 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for W. Carl Spining. (mg)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#14 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not sign the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (mg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bristol Development Group, LLC. (Spining, W.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Carl Spining on behalf of Bristol Development Group, LLC (Spining, W.)
July 31, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert J. Mendes, R. Mark Donnell, Jr, and Todd E. Panther. (mg)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Icon in the Gulch Master Condominium Association, Inc.. (Panther, Todd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd E. Panther on behalf of Icon in the Gulch Master Condominium Association, Inc. (Panther, Todd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Mark Donnell, Jr on behalf of Bristol Development Group, LLC (Donnell, R.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Mendes on behalf of Bristol Development Group, LLC (Mendes, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Columbia National Insurance Co.. Icon In The Gulch, LLC served on 7/17/2019. (Blair, Rebecca)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Columbia National Insurance Co.. Bristol Development Group, LLC served on 7/17/2019. (Blair, Rebecca)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Columbia National Insurance Co.. Icon in the Gulch Master Condominium Association, Inc. served on 7/17/2019. (Blair, Rebecca)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Bristol Development Group, LLC, Icon In The Gulch, LLC, and Icon in the Gulch Master Condominium Association, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
July 11, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rebecca Cothran Blair. (mg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Columbia National Insurance Co. (mg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bristol Development Group, LLC, Icon In The Gulch, LLC, Icon in the Gulch Master Condominium Association, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2950073), filed by Columbia National Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (Part 1) - Insurance Policies, #2 Exhibit A - (Part 2) - Insurance Policies, #3 Exhibit B - Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit C - Arbitration Award, #5 Exhibit D - (Part 1) - Complaint/Application and Amended Complaint/Application, #6 Exhibit D - (Part 2) - Complaint/Application and Amended Complaint/Application, #7 Exhibit D - (Part 3) - Complaint/Application and Amended Complaint/Application, #8 Exhibit E - Answer to Complaint/Application, #9 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia National Insurance Co. v. Icon In The Gulch, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia National Insurance Co.
Represented By: Rebecca Cothran Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Icon In The Gulch, LLC
Represented By: Vic L. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Icon in the Gulch Master Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Todd E. Panther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Development Group, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Mendes
Represented By: George Andrew Rowlett
Represented By: R. Mark Donnell, Jr.
Represented By: W. Carl Spining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?