Ross v. Walmart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Victoria Hill Ross
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00593
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 1/12/2021. Witness List due by 1/12/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2021 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 2/6/2020. Discovery due by 5/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference held on 8/26/2019. (Hearing lasted :10)(kb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Rowlett, George)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/26/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/21/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 03:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/23/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Rowlett, George)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 03:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Stores East, LP.(Rowlett, George)
July 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles Galloway Blackard, III, George Andrew Rowlett. (am)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Walmart Stores East, LP. (am)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Stores East, LP from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 19C-1242. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2950708) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Notice of Filing to State Court, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Walmart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Represented By: George Andrew Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Hill Ross
Represented By: Charles Galloway Blackard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?