Adams et al v. Wellness Solutions Geriatrics, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Veliska Thomas, Megan Parton, Chered Pearson, Phyllis Kennedy Howell, Janet Zarzour, Stephanie Salings, Mary E. Genung, Julia B. Morris, Kimberly S. Adams, Julie Horton, Junior Daniel, Amy Powers and Zach Bridges
Defendant: John W. Cain, II, Steven L. Scesa, Golden Griffon, LLC, Wellness Solutions Geriatrics, PLLC and Laura S. Reaves
Case Number: 3:2019cv00594
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference (Docket No. #18 ) is GRANTED. The defendants may have an extension to September 16, 2019 within which to respond to the Complaint, and the initial case management conference scheduled for September 11, 2019 is RESET for November 4, 2019 at 2:15 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Continue INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by John W. Cain, II, Golden Griffon, LLC, Laura S. Reaves, Steven L. Scesa, Wellness Solutions Geriatrics, PLLC. (Klett, Peter)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter F. Klett, III on behalf of All Defendants (Klett, Peter)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/11/2019 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 31, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Autumn Gentry and Charles Timothy Gary. (dt)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Timothy Gary on behalf of All Defendants (Gary, Charles)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Autumn Gentry on behalf of All Defendants (Gentry, Autumn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to Steven L. Scesa. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kimberly S. Adams as to Steven L. Scesa. (Humble, Gary)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Kimberly S. Adams. Wellness Solutions Geriatrics, PLLC served on 7/25/2019. (Humble, Gary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Kimberly S. Adams. Golden Griffon, LLC served on 7/22/2019. (Humble, Gary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Golden Griffon, LLC. (dt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 2:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Upon the reassignment of this case to Judge Trauger (Docket No. #6 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the reference to the magistrate judge is WITHDRAWN, and the initial case management conference scheduled before him on September 10, 2019 is CANCELLED. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard notice, setting this case for an initial case management conference before her on Wednesday, September 11, 2019 at 2:45 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/16/19. (dt)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to U.S. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger as a "Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:19-cv-00323. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/15/19. (dt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to John W. Cain, II, Golden Griffon, LLC, Laura S. Reaves, Steven L. Scesa, Wellness Solutions Geriatrics, PLLC. (dt) (Service copies for defendants Steven L. Scesa, Golden Griffon, LLC and Wellness Solutions Geriatrics, PLLC will be returned to counsel by mail. Service copies for John W. Cain, MD, and Laura S. Reaves will be picked up by counsel.) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/15/2019) (dt). Modified on 7/15/2019 (dt).
July 15, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gary S. Humble and James A. Fields. (dt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Junior Daniel, Megan Parton, Kimberly S. Adams, Julie Horton, Phyllis Kennedy Howell, Chered Pearson, Amy Powers, Zach Bridges, Veliska Thomas, Janet Zarzour, Julia B. Morris, Mary E. Genung, & Stephanie Salings. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2950808) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Wellness Solutions Geriatrics, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veliska Thomas
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Parton
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chered Pearson
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Kennedy Howell
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Zarzour
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Salings
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Genung
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia B. Morris
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly S. Adams
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Horton
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Daniel
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Powers
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Bridges
Represented By: Gary S. Humble
Represented By: James A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Cain, II
Represented By: Charles Timothy Gary
Represented By: Peter F. Klett, III
Represented By: Autumn Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Scesa
Represented By: Charles Timothy Gary
Represented By: Peter F. Klett, III
Represented By: Autumn Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Griffon, LLC
Represented By: Charles Timothy Gary
Represented By: Peter F. Klett, III
Represented By: Autumn Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellness Solutions Geriatrics, PLLC
Represented By: Charles Timothy Gary
Represented By: Peter F. Klett, III
Represented By: Autumn Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura S. Reaves
Represented By: Charles Timothy Gary
Represented By: Peter F. Klett, III
Represented By: Autumn Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?