Lawson v. Hairston et al
Plaintiff: Cory D. Lawson
Defendant: Blue Mountain Transportation, LLC and Camare Hairston
Case Number: 3:2019cv00617
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Mountain Transportation, LLC. (Shelby, Nathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Mountain Transportation, LLC, Camare Hairston.(Shelby, Nathan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Cory D. Lawson. Camare Hairston served on 8/3/2019. (McKay, Travis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Cory D. Lawson. Blue Mountain Transportation, LLC served on 8/2/2019. (McKay, Travis)
August 22, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Nathan E. Shelby. (mg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Shelby on behalf of All Defendants (Shelby, Nathan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (mg)
July 23, 2019 AL State Bar status verified as active for Travis G. McKay, Jr. McKay has been admitted to practice in this district. (mg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Blue Mountain Transportation, LLC, Camare Hairston. Service copies picked-up at Intake. (mg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Mountain Transportation, LLC, Camare Hairston (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675055642), filed by Cory D. Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Filing Fee Recepit)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Hairston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Mountain Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Jordan K. Gibson
Represented By: Nathan E. Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camare Hairston
Represented By: Jordan K. Gibson
Represented By: Nathan E. Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory D. Lawson
Represented By: Travis G. McKay, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?