Seanache Homes, Inc. et al v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: Richard Potts and Seanache Homes, Inc.
Defendant: River Edge Inn, LLC, Mike Todd, Judy Larson, Jane McDonald, Scott Patchett, Parker Place Partners, LLC, Mainsale, LLC, Susan Oetzel, Diane Tito Griffin, Knox Valley Partners, LLC, Trey Cain, Mary M. Wester, Daniel Tito, Bill Gulas, IRA Innovations, LLC, Patrick Moss, Craig Dowling, Steven Brakman, Carol Smith, Tennessee Title & Escrow Affiliates, LLC, David Kovach, Cain & Associates, PLLC, Morris Family Holdings, LLC, Jerry Larson and Kali Cain
Case Number: 3:2019cv00625
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #26 Notice of Appearance by Samantha A. Foster on behalf of Patrick Moss (Foster, Samantha)
September 10, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #25 Notice of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Patrick Moss (Burns, Robert)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#25 & #26 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha A. Foster on behalf of Patrick Moss (Foster, Samantha)
September 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Patrick Moss (Burns, Robert)
September 6, 2019 Defendant IRA Innovations, LLC terminated as a party pursuant to #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of a Party. (ds)
September 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant IRA Innovations, LLC filed by Richard Potts (Oakley, Gregory)
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steven Brakman, Craig Dowling, Diane Tito Griffin, David Kovach, Jerry Larson, Judy Larson, Mainsale, LLC, Parker Place Partners, LLC, Scott Patchett, Mary M. Wester . (Burns, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Steven Brakman, Craig Dowling, Diane Tito Griffin, David Kovach, Jerry Larson, Judy Larson, Mainsale, LLC, Parker Place Partners, LLC, Scott Patchett, Mary M. Wester. (Burns, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kali Cain, Trey Cain, Cain & Associates, PLLC, Knox Valley Partners, LLC, Morris Family Holdings, LLC, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt of Complaint)(Lopez, Christina) Modified on 9/4/2019 (dt).
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Kali Cain, Trey Cain, Cain & Associates, PLLC, Knox Valley Partners, LLC, Morris Family Holdings, LLC, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Lopez, Christina) Modified on 9/4/2019 (dt).
August 30, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert M. Burns, Samantha A. Foster and Christina R. Lopez. (dt)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Tennessee Title & Escrow Affiliates, LLC answer due 9/24/2012. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/30/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha A. Foster on behalf of Steven Brakman, Jerry Larson, Judy Larson, Jane McDonald, Parker Place Partners, LLC (Foster, Samantha)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Steven Brakman, Jerry Larson, Judy Larson, Jane McDonald, Parker Place Partners, LLC (Burns, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Tennessee Title & Escrow Affiliates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lopez, Christina)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina R. Lopez on behalf of Kali Cain, Trey Cain, Cain & Associates, PLLC, Knox Valley Partners, LLC, Morris Family Holdings, LLC, River Edge Inn, LLC, Tennessee Title & Escrow Affiliates, LLC (Lopez, Christina)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha A. Foster on behalf of David Kovach, Mainsale, LLC, Carol Smith, Mary M. Wester (Foster, Samantha)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of David Kovach, Mainsale, LLC, Carol Smith, Mary M. Wester (Burns, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha A. Foster on behalf of Craig Dowling, Diane Tito Griffin, Susan Oetzel, Scott Patchett (Foster, Samantha)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Craig Dowling, Diane Tito Griffin, Susan Oetzel, Scott Patchett (Burns, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha A. Foster on behalf of Daniel Tito (Foster, Samantha)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Daniel Tito (Burns, Robert)
August 22, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael G. Abelow. (dt)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Seanache Homes, Inc., Richard Potts. IRA Innovations, LLC served on 8/19/2019. (Scarbrough, J.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Abelow on behalf of Kali Cain, Trey Cain, Cain & Associates, PLLC, Knox Valley Partners, LLC, Morris Family Holdings, LLC, River Edge Inn, LLC, Tennessee Title & Escrow Affiliates, LLC (Abelow, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Seanache Homes, Inc., Richard Potts. Steven Brakman served on 8/12/2019; Kali Cain served on 8/13/2019; Trey Cain served on 8/13/2019; Cain & Associates, PLLC served on 8/13/2019; Craig Dowling served on 8/12/2019; Diane Tito Griffin served on 8/12/2019; Knox Valley Partners, LLC served on 8/13/2019; David Kovach served on 8/12/2019; Jerry Larson served on 8/12/2019; Judy Larson served on 8/12/2019; Mainsale, LLC served on 8/13/2019; Morris Family Holdings, LLC served on 8/13/2019; Parker Place Partners, LLC served on 8/13/2019; Scott Patchett served on 8/12/2019; River Edge Inn, LLC served on 8/13/2019; Tennessee Title & Escrow Affiliates, LLC served on 8/13/2012; Mary M. Wester served on 8/12/2019. (Scarbrough, J.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Steven Brakman, Kali Cain, Trey Cain, Cain & Associates, PLLC, Craig Dowling, Diane Tito Griffin, IRA Innovations, LLC, Knox Valley Partners, LLC, David Kovach, Jerry Larson, Judy Larson, Mainsale, LLC, Morris Family Holdings, LLC, Susan Oetzel, Parker Place Partners, LLC, Scott Patchett, River Edge Inn, LLC, Carol Smith, Tennessee Title & Escrow Affiliates, LLC, Mary M. Wester. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (dt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 1:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
July 24, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Brad Scarbrough and Gregory H. Oakley. (dt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Brakman, Kali Cain, Trey Cain, Cain & Associates, PLLC, Craig Dowling, Diane Tito Griffin, Bill Gulas, IRA Innovations, LLC, Knox Valley Partners, LLC, David Kovach, Jerry Larson, Judy Larson, Mainsale, LLC, Jane McDonald, Morris Family Holdings, LLC, Patrick Moss, Susan Oetzel, Parker Place Partners, LLC, Scott Patchett, River Edge Inn, LLC, Carol Smith, Tennessee Title & Escrow Affiliates, LLC, Daniel Tito, Mike Todd and Mary M. Wester (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2956731), filed by Seanache Homes, Inc., Richard Potts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mainsale Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wester Promissory Note, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (No summons provided with the complaint.) Modified on 7/24/2019 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seanache Homes, Inc. et al v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Edge Inn, LLC
Represented By: Christina R. Lopez
Represented By: Michael G. Abelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Larson
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane McDonald
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Patchett
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Place Partners, LLC
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainsale, LLC
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Oetzel
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Tito Griffin
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox Valley Partners, LLC
Represented By: Christina R. Lopez
Represented By: Michael G. Abelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trey Cain
Represented By: Christina R. Lopez
Represented By: Michael G. Abelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary M. Wester
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Tito
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Gulas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRA Innovations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Moss
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Dowling
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Brakman
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Smith
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Title & Escrow Affiliates, LLC
Represented By: Christina R. Lopez
Represented By: Michael G. Abelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kovach
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cain & Associates, PLLC
Represented By: Christina R. Lopez
Represented By: Michael G. Abelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Family Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christina R. Lopez
Represented By: Michael G. Abelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Larson
Represented By: Samantha A. Foster
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kali Cain
Represented By: Christina R. Lopez
Represented By: Michael G. Abelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Potts
Represented By: Gregory H. Oakley
Represented By: J. Brad Scarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seanache Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory H. Oakley
Represented By: J. Brad Scarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?