Ismail v. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Abdulkadir Y. Ismail
Defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00642
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2019; ORDER to enter. (Tape #digital recording.) (Hearing lasted :37)(jwc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Abdulkadir Y. Ismail. (McElhaney, Rocky)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc..(Boyte, Katherine)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., filed by Abdulkadir Y. Ismail.(McElhaney, Rocky)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc..(Boyte, Katherine)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/30/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Boyte, Katherine)
July 29, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Katherine D. Boyte, Nelson Suarez, Rocky McElhaney, Michael Philip Fisher. (am)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 19C1492. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2960566) (Attachments: #1 Attachment -Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit B - Proof of Service)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ismail v. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Represented By: Nelson Suarez
Represented By: Katherine D. Boyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulkadir Y. Ismail
Represented By: Rocky McElhaney
Represented By: Michael Philip Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?