Lokey, Jr. v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jerry Kenneth Lokey, Jr.
Defendant: Social Security Administration, William Pelham Barr and Donald Q. Cochran
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2019cv00656
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To facilitate review of the administrative decision, the plaintiff is directed to file a motion for judgment based on the administrative record and an accompanying memorandum in support of the motion within twenty-eight (28) days of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/24/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 SSA Administrative Record filed per #14 Answer to Social Security Complaint.. (Coleman, Bert)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Social Security Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Coleman, Bert)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Bert Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/24/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
September 19, 2019 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (mg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Jerry Kenneth Lokey, Jr.. William Pelham Barr served on 8/19/2019. (Reasonover, Julie)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Jerry Kenneth Lokey, Jr.. Social Security Administration served on 8/19/2019. (Reasonover, Julie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Bert Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Jerry Kenneth Lokey, Jr.. Donald Q. Cochran served on 8/19/2019. (Reasonover, Julie)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 5 , 6 , 7 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the documents. (mg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 ***DISREGARD*** GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Atty General of the US Acknowledgement filed by Jerry Kenneth Lokey, Jr.. (Reasonover, Julie) Modified on 8/27/2019 (mg).
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD*** GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Office of Regional Chief Counsel Acknowledgement filed by Jerry Kenneth Lokey, Jr.. (Reasonover, Julie) Modified on 8/27/2019 (mg).
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD*** GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed US Attorney for the Middle District of TN Acknowledgement filed by Jerry Kenneth Lokey, Jr.. (Reasonover, Julie) Modified on 8/27/2019 (mg).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/1/2019. (mg)
August 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Julie A. Reasonover. (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2962827), filed by Jerry Kenneth Lokey, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lokey, Jr. v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Q. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Kenneth Lokey, Jr.
Represented By: Julie A. Reasonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?