Strand v. Waddell et al
Plaintiff: Diane Valerie Hill Strand
Defendant: William Lansdon and Carmon Waddell
Interested Party: Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00660
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Diane Valerie Hill Strand. (Kelly, F.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Amended Certificate of Service by William Lansdon.(Hall, Maria)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Estes Hall on behalf of William Lansdon (Hall, Maria)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [12 & 13]: Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jm)
September 16, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Maria Estes Hall. (jm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed as to TN Department of Commerce and Insurance on behalf of Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. Served on 8/29/2019. (jm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by William Lansdon.(Hall, Maria)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Estes Hall on behalf of William Lansdon (Hall, Maria)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carmon Waddell.(Sprader, Paul)
September 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Paul L. Sprader and Danica Renee Grosko. (jm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Danica Renee Grosko on behalf of Carmon Waddell (Grosko, Danica)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Sprader on behalf of Carmon Waddell (Sprader, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Diane Valerie Hill Strand. William Lansdon served on 8/13/2019. (Kelly, F.) Modified summons served date to reflect document on 8/22/2019 (jm).
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Diane Valerie Hill Strand. Carmon Waddell served on 8/12/2019. (Kelly, F.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Unnamed Defendant UIM Carrier. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/5/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to William Lansdon and Carmon Waddell. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
August 2, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for F. Dulin Kelly and Clinton L. Kelly. (jm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Lansdon, Carmon Waddell (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2963509), filed by Diane Valerie Hill Strand. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strand v. Waddell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lansdon
Represented By: Maria Estes Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmon Waddell
Represented By: Danica Renee Grosko
Represented By: Paul L. Sprader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Valerie Hill Strand
Represented By: F. Dulin Kelly
Represented By: Clinton L. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?