Brown v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shanda Brown
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00680
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed Standard Insurance Company served on 8/13/2019. (jw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Shanda Brown. (Travis, Lauren)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Count II of the Complaint by Shanda Brown. (Travis, Lauren)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Wallace, Chad)
August 29, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Chad E. Wallace. (jm)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Wallace, Chad)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad E. Wallace on behalf of Standard Insurance Company (Wallace, Chad)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#6 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jm)
August 27, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Chad E. Wallace. (jm)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad E. Wallace on behalf of Standard Insurance Company (Wallace, Chad)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 03:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
August 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for K. Cody Allison, Samuel D. Payne, and Lauren W. Travis. (jm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2966970), filed by Shanda Brown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanda Brown
Represented By: Samuel D. Payne
Represented By: Lauren W. Travis
Represented By: K. Cody Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Chad E. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?