Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Hayward et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Carolyn Hayward, Darlene Hayward, Dawn M. Hayward and Loren M. Willis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00681
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Deposit or Invest Funds into the Court by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order Authorizing Interpleader Deposit)(Tarpley, John)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on October 7, 2019. (Doc. No. #6 .) The docket shows that three of the four defendants have not appeared or filed a responsive pleading. The initial case management conference is RESET for November 21, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall file a joint proposed case management order by November 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/1/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) Modified on 10/2/2019 (jm).
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Loren M. Willis served on 8/28/2019. (Tarpley, John)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Loren M. Willis.(jw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Darlene Hayward served on 8/28/2019. (Tarpley, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Dawn M. Hayward served on 8/19/2019. (Tarpley, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Carolyn Hayward served on 8/19/2019. (Tarpley, John)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/13/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Carolyn Hayward, Darlene Hayward, Dawn M. Hayward, and Loren M. Willis. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (jm)
August 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Roy Tarpley. (jm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn Hayward, Darlene Hayward, Dawn M. Hayward, and Loren M. Willis (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2966960), filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Beneficiary Designation, #3 Exhibit B - Beneficiary Designation, #4 Exhibit C - Death Certificate, #5 Exhibit D - Claim Form, #6 Exhibit E - Hayward Letter, #7 Exhibit F - OFEGLI Letter, #8 Exhibit G - Medical Record, #9 Exhibit H - OFEGLI Letters, #10 Exhibit I - Hayward Letter) (jm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #11 Attachment - Filing Fee Receipt) (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Hayward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn M. Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren M. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?