Kinne v. Moss et al
Plaintiff: Mary Kinne
Defendant: Terrance A. Moss, Lyft, Inc. and Antoinette L. Moss
Case Number: 3:2019cv00688
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Summons issued as to Antoinette L. Moss, Terrance A. Moss. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
September 27, 2019 Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference is RESET for November 15, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a joint proposed initial case management order no later than three days after that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/27/2019. (jw)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Mary Kinne. (Stolte, Aldo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Lyft, Inc.. (Kopet, Angela)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Blair Pierson Durham and Aaron B. Woodard terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/25/2019. (jw)
September 25, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Aldo J. Stolte. (jw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Aldo J. Stolte on behalf of Mary Kinne (Stolte, Aldo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mary Kinne. (Stolte, Aldo)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. of Change of Firm Name and Email Address (Kopet, Angela)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Kopet, Angela)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
August 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Blair Pierson Durham, Aaron B. Woodard and Angela Cirina Kopet. (jw)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lyft, Inc. from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number CC2019CV1370. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2968484) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint & Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - Answer of Lyft, Inc, d/b/a Lyft Tennessee, Inc.)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinne v. Moss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance A. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Cirina Kopet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette L. Moss
Represented By: Angela Cirina Kopet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kinne
Represented By: Aaron B. Woodard
Represented By: Blair Pierson Durham
Represented By: Aldo J. Stolte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?