Cotton v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Douglas Cotton
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00696
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Joint) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (de Quesada, Maria)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/23/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Maria T. de Quesada. (mg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(de Quesada, Maria)
September 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for George Andrew Rowlett. (mg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George Andrew Rowlett on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Rowlett, George)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Douglas Cotton. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. served on 8/22/2019. (Capps, Bryan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
August 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Bryan L. Capps. (mg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2969268), filed by Douglas Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotton v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Maria T. de Quesada
Represented By: George Andrew Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Cotton
Represented By: Bryan L. Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?