Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Truong et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Envy Restaurant & Bar LLC and Ve Truong
Case Number: 3:2019cv00701
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Attachment Proposed Clerk's Certificate, #3 Attachment Certificate of Service)(McIntire, Neil)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The initial case management conference in this action is RESET to Friday, October 18, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/3/2019. (jm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Envy Restaurant & Bar LLC served on 8/27/2019. (McIntire, Neil)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Ve Truong served on 8/27/2019. (McIntire, Neil)
August 20, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Julie Cohen Lonstein. (jm)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Julie Cohen Lonstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Julie Lonstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2972565) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Julie Lonstein, #2 Attachment Exhibit A to Aff of Julie Lonstein, #3 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing A, #4 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing B, #5 Attachment Proposed Order)(McIntire, Neil)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Resetting of Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (jm)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#6 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (jm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (McIntire, Neil)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Julie Cohen Lonstein: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/3/2019. (jm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (jm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Envy Restaurant & Bar LLC and Ve Truong. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
August 13, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Julie Cohen Lonstein; TN State Bar status verified as active for Neil M. McIntire. (jm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Envy Restaurant & Bar LLC and Ve Truong (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2970261), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Copyright Notice, #3 Exhibit - A) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Truong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envy Restaurant & Bar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ve Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Neil M. McIntire
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?