Brown v. Dave & Buster's Management Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Arthur Brown
Defendant: Dave & Buster's Management Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00705
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Arthur Brown Substitution of Counsel (Doolan, Jonathan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Dave & Buster's Management Corporation, Inc..(Martin, Sean)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/14/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Sarah Booher and Tess Heisserer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 9/4/2019. (dt)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt)
August 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Sarah Booher, Sean W. Martin and Tess Heisserer. (dt)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dave & Buster's Management Corporation, Inc.. (Martin, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dave & Buster's Management Corporation, Inc. from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19C1712. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2971186) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - State Court Complaint, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Dave & Buster's Management Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave & Buster's Management Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Sean W. Martin
Represented By: Tess Heisserer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Brown
Represented By: Sarah Booher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?