Lawhorn v. TrustPoint Hospital, LLC
Plaintiff: Kevin Lawhorn
Defendant: TrustPoint Hospital, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00706
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TrustPoint Hospital, LLC. (Jodway, Kierstin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kevin Lawhorn. (mg)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: By Order entered September 3, 2019 (Docket Entry No. #8 ), the Court referred this pro se action to the Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(c)(1), this case is exempt from customized case management. By separate order, the Court will enter a scheduling order setting out deadlines for the progression of this case. Plaintiff is advised that Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss this case. See Docket Entry No. #6 . Plaintiff is given until October 4, 2019, to file a response to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/5/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TrustPoint Hospital, LLC . (Jodway, Kierstin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by TrustPoint Hospital, LLC. (Jodway, Kierstin)
August 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark W. Peters. (mg)
August 21, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form, and a Notice, Consent form included.) (mg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Peters on behalf of TrustPoint Hospital, LLC (Peters, Mark)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TrustPoint Hospital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Parent Company List)(Jodway, Kierstin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark W. Peters, and Kierstin P. Jodway. (mg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TrustPoint Hospital, LLC from Rutherford County Circuit Court, case number 76070. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2971960) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Attachment - Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawhorn v. TrustPoint Hospital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrustPoint Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Kierstin P. Jodway
Represented By: Mark W. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?