Parrish v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Jonathan S. Parrish
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv00718
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff is advised that Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss this case. See Docket Entry No. 9. Plaintiff is given until October 4, 2019, to file a response to the motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is advised that his failure to file a timely response may result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/5/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barbara Holmes. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Mr. Haltom is hereby permitted to withdraw as counsel of record effective immediately and that attorney Woods Drinkwater with Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough will continue to represent U.S. Bank. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/30/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Auman Haltom terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/30/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (jw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Haltom, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by U.S. Bank National Association . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2004 HELOC Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2019 HELOC Assignment)(Drinkwater, William)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by U.S. Bank National Association. (Drinkwater, William)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jw)
August 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Disregard DE #4 - entered in error. (jw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 ***DISREGARD - ENTERED in ERROR*** NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 1:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw) Modified on 8/21/2019 (jw).
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
August 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Auman Haltom and William W. Drinkwater. (jw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (jw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank National Association from Davidson County Chancery Court, case number 19-729-III. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2973949) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Removal Notice, #4 Exhibit C - Property Record Card, #5 Exhibit D - 4804 Danby Drive)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan S. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?