The Pictsweet Company v. R.D. Offutt Company et al
Plaintiff: The Pictsweet Company
Defendant: R.D. Offutt Company-Northwest, R.D. Offutt Company and CRF Frozen Foods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00722
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/4/2019 at 02:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Reset Initial Case Management Conference. The Joint Motion is GRANTED, and the Initial Case Management Conference is reset to Monday, November 4, 2019 at 2:45 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/30/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by R.D. Offutt Company-Northwest.(Bernstein, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by R.D. Offutt Company.(Bernstein, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by CRF Frozen Foods, LLC.(Bernstein, Kevin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Motion to Reset Initial Case Management Conference by The Pictsweet Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Phillips, W.) Modified Text on 9/23/2019 (am).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Alysssa L. Rebensdorf to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Alysssa L. Rebensdorf to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2987348) by R.D. Offutt Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Watson, Cameron)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer CRF Frozen Foods, LLC answer due 9/25/2019; R.D. Offutt Company answer due 9/25/2019; R.D. Offutt Company-Northwest answer due 9/25/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/22/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (am)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Alyssa L. Rebensdorf: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/12/2019. (am)
August 22, 2019 MN State Bar status verified as active for Alyssa L. Rebensdorf. (am)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CRF Frozen Foods, LLC, R.D. Offutt Company, R.D. Offutt Company-Northwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mail exchange, #2 Attachment Order)(Myatt, Christopher) Modified on 8/22/2019 (am).
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CRF Frozen Foods, LLC. (Myatt, Christopher) Modified Text on 8/22/2019 (am).
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CRF Frozen Foods, LLC. (Myatt, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R.D. Offutt Company-Northwest. (Myatt, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R.D. Offutt Company. (Myatt, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 (**DISREGARD, ATTORNEYS HAVE BEEN ADMITTED TO PRACTICE THIS COURT**)NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kevin D. Berstein, Cameron Watson: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/10/2019. (am) Modified on 8/28/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher M. Myatt, Kevin D. Bernstein, Cameron Watson, W. Brantley Phillips, Jr, Meredith M. Thompson. (am)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRF Frozen Foods, LLC, R.D. Offutt Company, R.D. Offutt Company-Northwest from Davidson County Chancery Court, case number 19-847-II. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2974736) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Return of Service, #3 Attachment - Return of Service)(am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #4 Attachment - Complaint) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Pictsweet Company v. R.D. Offutt Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D. Offutt Company-Northwest
Represented By: Christopher M. Myatt
Represented By: Cameron Watson
Represented By: Kevin D. Berstein
Represented By: Alyssa L. Rebensdorf
Represented By: Kevin D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D. Offutt Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Myatt
Represented By: Cameron Watson
Represented By: Kevin D. Berstein
Represented By: Alyssa L. Rebensdorf
Represented By: Kevin D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRF Frozen Foods, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Myatt
Represented By: Cameron Watson
Represented By: Kevin D. Berstein
Represented By: Alyssa L. Rebensdorf
Represented By: Kevin D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Pictsweet Company
Represented By: W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Meredith M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?