Trombley v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Roger Trombley
Defendant: H. James Williams, William Norris Jennings, Michael Dinkins, K. Ranga Krishnan, James S. Ely, III, Julia B. North, Tim L. Hingtgen, Thomas J. Aaron, John A. Clerico, Larry Cash, Wayne T. Smith, Kevin J. Hammons, John A. Fry and Community Health Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00733
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Milton S. McGee, III, Steven Allen Riley. (am)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Limited Stay of Proceedings by Thomas J. Aaron, Larry Cash, John A. Clerico, Community Health Systems, Inc., Michael Dinkins, James S. Ely, III, John A. Fry, Kevin J. Hammons, Tim L. Hingtgen, William Norris Jennings, K. Ranga Krishnan, Julia B. North, Wayne T. Smith, H. James Williams. (Riley, Steven)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Community Health Systems, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Allen Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Steven)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Milton S. McGee, III on behalf of All Defendants (McGee, Milton)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Samir Shukurov to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/30/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Gregory M. Nespole to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/30/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Samir Shukurov to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2983029) by Roger Trombley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Samir Shukurov, #2 Attachment - Certification of Good Standing for Samir Shukurov)(Martin, Jerry)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Gregory M. Nespole to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2982993) by Roger Trombley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Gregory Mark Nespole, #2 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing for Gregory Mark Nespole)(Martin, Jerry)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/21/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/23/2019) (am).
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (am)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Gregory M. Nespole, Samir Shukurov: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/11/2019. (am)
August 21, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (TN) Jerry E. Martin, (TN) David W. Garrison, (NY) Gregory M. Nespole, (NY) Samir Shukurov. (am)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Thomas J. Aaron, Larry Cash, John A. Clerico, Community Health Systems, Inc., Michael Dinkins, James S. Ely, III, John A. Fry, Kevin J. Hammons, Tim L. Hingtgen, William Norris Jennings, K. Ranga Krishnan, Julia B. North, Wayne T. Smith, H. James Williams. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas J. Aaron, Larry Cash, John A. Clerico, Michael Dinkins, James S. Ely, III, John A. Fry, Kevin J. Hammons, Tim L. Hingtgen, William Norris Jennings, K. Ranga Krishnan, Julia B. North, Wayne T. Smith, Community Health Systems, Inc., H. James Williams (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2975854), filed by Roger Trombley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am) Modified Text on 8/21/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trombley v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. James Williams
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Norris Jennings
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dinkins
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Ranga Krishnan
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Ely, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia B. North
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim L. Hingtgen
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Aaron
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Clerico
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cash
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne T. Smith
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Hammons
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Fry
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Trombley
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Gregory M. Nespole
Represented By: Samir Shukurov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?