Boyd v. Glass et al
Plaintiff: Brian T. Boyd
Defendant: Tina Glass and Estate of Roger Glass
Case Number: 3:2019cv00741
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for October 22, 2019, is CANCELLED. Counsel for Plaintiff shall move to reset the initial case management conference, if appropriate, after the pending motions for entry of default have been addressed. So ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/18/2019. (hb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Tina Glass by Brian T. Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration, #2 Attachment proposed Order)(Wills, Bennett) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (jm).
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Estate of Roger Glass by Brian T. Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration, #2 Attachment proposed Order)(Wills, Bennett) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (jm).
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Brian T. Boyd. (Wills, Bennett)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on The Estate of Roger Glass on September 14, 2019, filed by Brian T. Boyd. (Boyd, Brian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Tina Glass on September 14, 2019, filed by Brian T. Boyd. (Boyd, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/13/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Estate of Roger Glass and Tina Glass. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
August 23, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brian T. Boyd and Bennett James Wills. (jm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of Roger Glass and Tina Glass (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2978052), filed by Brian T. Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - (COLLECTIVE) - EXECUTED Engagement Agreement(s), #3 Exhibit B - invoice_2379_Redacted) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Glass et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Roger Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian T. Boyd
Represented By: Brian T. Boyd
Represented By: Bennett James Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?