Lopez v. Minter
Petitioner: Jennifer Lopez
Respondent: Trinty Minter
Case Number: 3:2019cv00744
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Because the petition raises colorable claims for habeas relief, including insufficient evidence to support the conviction and ineffective assistance of trial counsel, the respondent is DIRECTED to file an answer, plead or otherwise respond to the petition in accordance with Rule 5 within 30 days of the entry of this order. The petitioner may file a reply to the respondent's answer limited to disputing specific points of fact or law raised by the answer within 30 days of the date the answer is filed. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/11/19. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail. Respondent and AG of TN with copy of petition and order by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIPT #34675056427 in the amount of $5.00 posted by Jennifer Lopez re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (mg)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The petitioner's IFP application (Doc. No. #3 ) is DENIED. The petitioner is DIRECTED to submit either the $5.00 fee or a second, properly supported IFP application within 28 days of the entry of this order. Her submission must reflect the docket number assigned to this case: 3:19-744. The court cautions petitioner that if she fails to comply with the instructions of the court within the specified time, or to advise the court promptly of any change of address, the court may dismiss this petition for failure to comply with the instructions of the court and for lack of prosecution. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/19. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 31, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard Davison Douglas. (dt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Davison Douglas on behalf of Trinty Minter (Douglas, Richard)
August 26, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet and blank, pro se forms included). (dt) Modified on 8/26/2019 (dt).
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jennifer Lopez. (dt)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jennifer Lopez. (dt)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jennifer Lopez.(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Trinty Minter
Represented By: Richard Davison Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jennifer Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?