Ragan v. Hall, Jr.
Petitioner: Teddy Ragan
Respondent: Hilton Hall, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00754
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's new deadline is November 9, 2019. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/18/19. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (dt)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Teddy Ragan. (dt)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Hilton Hall, Jr.. (Barker, Zachary)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Petitioner has also filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). (Doc. No. #3 .) However, Petitioner's IFP application is incomplete, as it is not accompanied by a certificate from an appropriate prison official showing the amount of money that he has in his inmate trust account. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send the petitioner a blank IFP application form. Petitioner has also failed to sign the petition as required by Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk is DIRECTED to return the petition's signature page (Doc. No. #1 at 14) to Petitioner. Petitioner MUST sign the petition's signature page and resubmit it with either the $5.00 filing fee or a properly completed IFP application. Petitioner's submission of these items must be RECEIVED in this Court within 28 days of the date this Order is entered on the docket and must include the docket number assigned to this case, No. 3:19-cv-00754. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/10/2019. (xc: Pro se party w/ IFP and page 14 of petition by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Zachary L. Barker. (dt)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary L. Barker on behalf of Hilton Hall, Jr. (Barker, Zachary)
August 28, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet and blank, pro se forms included). (dt)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Teddy Ragan. (dt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Arrest and Conviction re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Teddy Ragan. (dt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (unsigned)for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Teddy Ragan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Supporting Documents)(dt) Modified on 8/28/2019 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragan v. Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hilton Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teddy Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?