Chaney v. American Multi-Cinema, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frances Ola Chaney
Defendant: American Multi-Cinema, Inc. and Tennessee Tile & Marble Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00775
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by American Multi-Cinema, Inc..(Mantooth, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons issued as to Tennessee Tile & Marble Co., Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/18/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Tennessee Tile & Marble Co., Inc., filed by Frances Ola Chaney. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons to Def. TN Tile & Marble Co., Inc.)(Parsley, Benjamin)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend Complaint. Within 2 business days of the date of entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall file the First Amended Complaint with a proper electronic signature of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Frances Ola Chaney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Parsley, Benjamin)
September 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by American Multi-Cinema, Inc..(Mantooth, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by American Multi-Cinema, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Attachment Supplement to Exhibit A -- Order of Subsititution)(Mantooth, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
September 4, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for David Randall Mantooth and Benjamin L. Parsley, III. (dt)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Multi-Cinema, Inc.. (dt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Multi-Cinema, Inc. from Circuit Court for Rutherford County, Tennessee, case number 76183. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-2984693) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 9/3/2019 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaney v. American Multi-Cinema, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Ola Chaney
Represented By: Benjamin L. Parsley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Multi-Cinema, Inc.
Represented By: David Randall Mantooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Tile & Marble Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?