Humphrey v. Bukari Kwasi Yobonta et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Humphrey
Defendant: Thunder Logistics, Inc., Bukari Kwasi Yobonta and Aim Leasing Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00782
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Thunder Logistics, Inc. of Service of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Wyatt, Carl)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl K. Wyatt on behalf of Aim Leasing Company (Wyatt, Carl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Sheila Humphrey. (Smith, Brittany) Modified Text on 10/29/2019 (am).
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference reset for 11/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Thunder Logistics, Inc..(Wyatt, Carl)
September 6, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brittany Smith: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/27/2019. (am)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl K. Wyatt on behalf of Thunder Logistics, Inc. (Wyatt, Carl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Thunder Logistics, Inc.. (Wyatt, Carl)
September 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brittany Smith, Carl K. Wyatt. (am)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thunder Logistics, Inc. from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 19C1949. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2986764) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Complaint)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Bukari Kwasi Yobonta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bukari Kwasi Yobonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aim Leasing Company
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Humphrey
Represented By: Brittany Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?