Porter v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Karen Porter
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00792
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/17/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/7/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 30, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael F. Braun. (am)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Braun on behalf of Karen Porter (Braun, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/10/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Order of Substitution of Counsel by Karen Porter. (Bradshaw, James) Modified Text on 10/10/2019 (am).
September 13, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ruth Rizkalla, Michael Kelly, Behram Parekh: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/4/2019. (am)
September 13, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (CA) Ruth Rizkalla, (CA) Michael Kelly, (CA) Behram Parekh, (TN) James C. Bradshaw, III. (am)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2989809), filed by Karen Porter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Porter
Represented By: James C. Bradshaw, III
Represented By: Ruth Rizkalla
Represented By: Michael L. Kelly
Represented By: Michael F. Braun
Represented By: Behram Parekh
Represented By: Raymond T. Throckmorton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?