Hickman et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Danny L Hickman and Kim Hickman
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00802
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The stipulation is approved [#21]. The entire action, including all claims and counterclaims stated herein against all parties, is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/5/2019. (am)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 Joint Stipulation and Order for Dismissal without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, Danny L Hickman, Kim Hickman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Order)(am)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Judge Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley no longer assigned to case. Upon the transfer of this case to Judge Trauger (Docket No. 18), it is hereby ORDERED that the reference to the magistrate judge is WITHDRAWN, and the initial case management conference scheduled before him on November 12, 2019 is CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard Notice setting this case for an initial conference on November 21, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/2/2019. (am)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Aleta A. Trauger for all further proceedings. District Judge Eli J. Richardson no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/1/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Eric A. Paine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/27/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Dell P. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/27/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
September 25, 2019 SC State Bar status verified as active for Dell P. Chappell, Eric A. Paine. (am)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Eric A. Paine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2999494) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Dell P. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2999492) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Richard B. North, Jr. (North, Richard)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard B. North, Jr, Robert W Boatman, Mark Stephen O'Connor, Paul Lincoln Stoller, Shannon L Clark, C Lincoln Combs: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 10/9/2019. (am)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard B. North, Jr, Robert W Boatman, Mark Stephen O'Connor, Paul Lincoln Stoller, Shannon L Clark, C Lincoln Combs: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/9/2019. (am)
September 18, 2019 AZ State Bar status verified as active for Richard B. North, Jr, Robert W Boatman, Mark Stephen O'Connor, Paul Lincoln Stoller, Shannon L Clark, C Lincoln Combs. (am)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #9 Notice of Appearance (Ramsey, Shane)
September 16, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Shane G. Ramsey. (am)
September 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane G. Ramsey on behalf of All Defendants (Ramsey, Shane)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from the District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03771. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Middle District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3771-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13562759 filed by Danny L Hickman, Kim Hickman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickman et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny L Hickman
Represented By: Robert W Boatman
Represented By: Shannon L Clark
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Mark Stephen O'Connor
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Hickman
Represented By: Robert W Boatman
Represented By: Shannon L Clark
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Mark Stephen O'Connor
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?