Peterson v. Decker et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Peterson
Defendant: Jessie James Decker and JJD Marks, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00812
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Secure Local Counsel. This should be accomplished prior to the initial case management conference. (JBB)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Richard Liebowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/14/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Sawnie Robertson Aldredge. (am)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File associate with local counsel by Christopher Peterson. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Richard Liebowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3008868) by Christopher Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Liebowitz, Richard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JJD Marks, Inc.. (Aldredge, Sawnie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by JJD Marks, Inc..(Aldredge, Sawnie)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (am)
September 17, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 10/8/2019. (am)
September 17, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/8/2019. (am)
September 17, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard P. Liebowitz. (am)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Jessie James Decker, JJD Marks, Inc. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jessie James Decker, JJD Marks, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2992779), filed by Christopher Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Photograph, #3 Exhibit B - The Infringing Use, #4 Exhibit - Copyright Form)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie James Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJD Marks, Inc.
Represented By: Sawnie Robertson Aldredge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Peterson
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?