Gooden v. State of Tennessee
Plaintiff: Scott A. Gooden
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2019cv00814
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The petitioner is DIRECTED within twenty-eight (28) days of the date he receives this order either to pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. The petitioner is forewarned that his petition will not be filed until he does one or the other. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail the petitioner a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis for prisoners for his convenience. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/1/2019. (xc: Order & blank IFP form to pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
September 17, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet and blank, pro se forms included). (dt)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Tennessee, filed by Scott A. Gooden.(dt) Modified on 9/17/2019 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooden v. State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A. Gooden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?