Willard v. Leibach et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Willard
Defendant: Desirie Andrews, Blair Leibach, Diane Heath, f/n/u Byles, Correct Care Solution, Janet Usher, f/n/u Corlew, Teresa Clark, f/n/u Bachali, CoreCivic, Jeffrey Burris, Lori Baker, James Bridges, S Daniels and Debbie Adams
Case Number: 3:2019cv00823
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph F. Welborn, III, Erin Palmer Polly, Terrence M. McKelvey. (am)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer f/n/u Bachali answer due 11/22/2019; James Bridges answer due 11/22/2019; Janet Usher answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/31/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by f/n/u Bachali, James Bridges, Janet Usher. (Polly, Erin)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence M. McKelvey on behalf of f/n/u Bachali, James Bridges, Janet Usher (McKelvey, Terrence)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Palmer Polly on behalf of f/n/u Bachali, James Bridges, Janet Usher (Polly, Erin)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Welborn, III on behalf of f/n/u Bachali, James Bridges, Janet Usher (Welborn, Joseph)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed f/n/u Bachali served on 10/15/2019. (am)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed James Bridges served on 10/9/2019. (am)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed Janet Usher served on 10/9/2019. (am)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #6 Amended Complaint. (am)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #6 Amended Complaint. (am)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Debbie Adams, Lori Baker, Jeffrey Burris, S Daniels, filed by Brandon Willard.(am)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to f/n/u Bachali, James Bridges, Janet Usher. (Service packets sent to USMS to effect service.) (am) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/30/2019) (am).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Assessing Filing Fee $350 for Brandon Willard. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Metro- Davidson County Detention Facility to ensure that the custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account complies with the portion of 28 U.S.C. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ISSUE PROCESS to Defendants Bridges, Usher, and Bachali at the address provided in the complaint. All other Defendants to this lawsuit are DISMISSED, without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to file a timely amended complaint alleging facts establishing their liability in the alleged violation of his Eighth Amendment rights. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/27/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Administrator of M.D.C.D.F. sent a copy of this order by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 (Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Brandon Willard. (afs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Desirie Andrews, f/n/u Bachali, f/n/u Byles, Teresa Clark, CoreCivic, f/n/u Corlew, Correct Care Solution, Diane Heath, Blair Leibach, Janet Usher, James Bridges, filed by Brandon Willard.(afs) Modified on 9/24/2019 (afs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willard v. Leibach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desirie Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair Leibach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Byles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Usher
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Represented By: Terrence M. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Bachali
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Represented By: Terrence M. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bridges
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Represented By: Terrence M. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?