Teats v. Phillips
Petitioner: Jerome Maurice Teats
Respondent: Shawn Phillips
Case Number: 3:2019cv00841
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 (Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs)
October 2, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Matthew Stahl. (jm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Matthew Stahl on behalf of Shawn Phillips (Stahl, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 RECEIPT #34675056390 in the amount of $5.00 posted by Jimmy Teats re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (dt)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Permission to Reserve Right to Proceed In Forma Pauperis In Later Proceedings by Jerome Maurice Teats. (afs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jerome Maurice Teats. (afs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 Statement of facts filed by Jerome Maurice Teats. (afs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Facts Supporting Each Ground Raised in 2254 Petition filed by Jerome Maurice Teats in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (afs) Modified on 10/4/2019 (afs).
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jerome Maurice Teats. (afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teats v. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerome Maurice Teats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Phillips
Represented By: Michael Matthew Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?