Zlozower v. Gibson Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Neil Zlozower
Defendant: Gibson Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00842
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gibson Brands, Inc..(Parker, R.)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/7/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/7/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Richard Liebowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/21/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Neil Zlozower re #12 MOTION for attorney Richard Liebowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012345) (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 18, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#12 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (am)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Richard Liebowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012345) by Neil Zlozower. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Liebowitz, Richard)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Gibson Brands, Inc. answer due 11/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/15/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The order referring this matter entered on September 24, 2019 (Doc. No. 6) is VACATED. This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Eli J. Richardson recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr for all further proceedings. I hereby recuse myself in this matter. The file shall be returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/10/2019. (am)
October 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Gregory Parker, Sara K. Morgan. (am)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara K. Morgan on behalf of Gibson Brands, Inc. (Morgan, Sara)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading- Unopposed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Parker, R.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Gregory Parker on behalf of Gibson Brands, Inc. (Parker, R.)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 *VACATED PER DE: #11 **ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/24/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified on 10/11/2019 (am).
September 24, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 10/15/2019. (am)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/15/2019. (am)
September 24, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard P. Liebowitz. (am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Gibson Brands, Inc. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gibson Brands, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2998293), filed by Neil Zlozower. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Photograph, #3 Exhibit B - Infringing Use)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zlozower v. Gibson Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Zlozower
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Sara K. Morgan
Represented By: R. Gregory Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?