Fossick et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Fossick and Tommy Fossick
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00847
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Callaway, Gregory)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/12/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. without prejudice by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Order)(Callaway, Gregory)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Callaway, Gregory)
October 29, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Phillip G. Gombar. (mg)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ashley Fossick.(Gombar, Phillip)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip G. Gombar on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gombar, Phillip)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 7-8: The pdf document attached to this entry cannot be opened or viewed. THESE DOCUMENTS SHALL BE RE-FILED. (dt)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ashley Fossick.(Gombar, Phillip)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip G. Gombar on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gombar, Phillip)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Callaway, Gregory)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment attachment to business entity disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
September 27, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph Weir, and Gregory W. Callaway. (mg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from Fifth Circuit Court of Davidson County, Tennessee at Nashville, case number 19C2036. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3000810) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Summons, #2 Attachment - Complaint, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fossick et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Fossick
Represented By: Joseph Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Fossick
Represented By: Joseph Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?