Kemp v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lakeita Kemp
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00854
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Reassign Case to Magistrate Judge and Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Carpenter, Brigid)
November 7, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brigid M. Carpenter. (dt)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Deadline for Nissan North America, Inc.'s Response to Complaint by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Carpenter, Brigid)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/2/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/28/19. (dt)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Lynn A. Toops to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/23/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 22, 2019 IN State Bar status verified as active for Lynn A. Toops. (dt)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Lisa M. La Fornara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Lisa M. La Fornara to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3015815) by Lakeita Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lisa M. La Fornara in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Lynn A. Toops to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3015814) by Lakeita Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lynn A. Toops in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Lakeita Kemp. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. served on 10/15/2019. (Gastel, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Lakeita Kemp. Nissan North America, Inc. served on 10/15/2019. (Gastel, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. (dt)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/3/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 2, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lynn A. Toops and Lisa M. La Fornara: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/23/2019. (dt)
October 2, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV and Benjamin A. Gastel. IN State Bar status verified as active for Lisa M. La Fornara. (dt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-3001839), filed by Lakeita Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(hb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeita Kemp
Represented By: Lisa M. La Fornara
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?