Higgins v. Barkley et al
Plaintiff: Patrick S. Higgins
Defendant: Ron Hodges and Sally Barkley
Case Number: 3:2019cv00887
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and per Judge Campbell's chambers.*** (mg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Patrick S. Higgins (Zralek, Stephen)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Patrick S. Higgins. Ron Hodges served on 10/16/2019. (Zralek, Stephen)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Patrick S. Higgins. Sally Barkley served on 10/16/2019. (Zralek, Stephen)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/10/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Sally Barkley, and Ron Hodges. Service copies given to Runner at Intake. (mg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
October 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephen J. Zralek. (mg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sally Barkley, Ron Hodges (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3007229), filed by Patrick S. Higgins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Submitted Application, #2 Exhibit B - Submitted Application, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Opposition, #4 Exhibit D - Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Demand Letter, #6 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Attachment 6 replaced on 10/8/2019) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins v. Barkley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick S. Higgins
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?