Patterson et al v. Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janet Patterson and Harold Patterson
Defendant: David Floyd, Brenda Estes, Gary Estes and Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00912
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by Janet Patterson, Harold Patterson. Gary Estes served on 11/7/2019. (Crain, Larry)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed by Janet Patterson, Harold Patterson. Brenda Estes served on 11/7/2019. (Crain, Larry)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by Janet Patterson, Harold Patterson. David Floyd served on 11/6/2019. (Crain, Larry)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Janet Patterson, Harold Patterson. Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc. served on 10/28/2019. (Crain, Larry)
November 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alvin L. Harris. (am)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant permitted to answer or otherwise respond by 12/16/19. ICMC RESCHEDULED to 1/29/19 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 14, 2019 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant shall have until 12/16/19 to answer or otherwise respond. Because the ICMC is currently set for 12/17/19, the Court hereby ORDERS that the ICMC is RESCHEDULED for January 29, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Brenda Estes. (Harris, Alvin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc., Gary Estes, David Floyd. (Freeman, Andrea)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin L. Harris on behalf of Brenda Estes (Harris, Alvin)
November 7, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gerald C. Wigger, Andrea S. Freeman. (am)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc.. (Wigger, Gerald)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea S. Freeman on behalf of Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc., Gary Estes, David Floyd (Freeman, Andrea)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald C. Wigger on behalf of Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc., Gary Estes, David Floyd (Wigger, Gerald)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/17/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
October 16, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kathy T. Trawick, Larry Lamont Crain. (am)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc., Brenda Estes, Gary Estes, David Floyd. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc., Brenda Estes, Gary Estes, David Floyd (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3012796), filed by Janet Patterson, Harold Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson et al v. Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Floyd
Represented By: Andrea S. Freeman
Represented By: Gerald C. Wigger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Estes
Represented By: Alvin L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Estes
Represented By: Andrea S. Freeman
Represented By: Gerald C. Wigger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Hill Village Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea S. Freeman
Represented By: Gerald C. Wigger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Patterson
Represented By: Kathy T. Trawick
Represented By: Larry Lamont Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Patterson
Represented By: Kathy T. Trawick
Represented By: Larry Lamont Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?