Franch v. SmileDirectClub, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adam Franch and Adam Franchi
Defendant: William Blair & Company, LLC, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Stifel, Kyle Wailes, Susan Greenspon Rammelt, David Katzman, Guggenheim Securities, LL, UBS Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Jefferies, LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Steven Katzman, Alexander Fenkell, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Richard Schnall, Bofa Securities, Inc., Jordan Katzman and Guggenheim Securities, LLC
Petitioner: 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund, Thomas Derus, Wei Wei, Joe Stofko, Camelot Event Driven Fund and Granite Point Capital 8 Dragons China Opportunities Fund, Granite Point Capital Master Fund, LP, Granite Point Capital Scorpion Focused Ideas Fund, and Granite Point Capital Panacea Global Healthcare
Intervenor Plaintiff: TRUSTEE MICHAEL J MORSE
Case Number: 3:2019cv00962
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Phillip Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Laurence M. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Phillip Kim filed by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei re: #45 MOTION for attorney Phillip Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3044986). (Holifield, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Laurence M. Rosen filed by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei re: #44 MOTION for attorney Laurence M. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3044979). (Holifield, James)
December 17, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Christopher J. Keller, Eric J. Belfi, David J. Schwartz, Francis P. McConville. (am)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Christopher J. Keller, Eric J. Belfi, David J. Schwartz, Francis P. McConville: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 1/7/2020. (am)
December 16, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel For Lead Plaintiff and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to appoint Lead Plaintiff, #24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund. (Wood, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE by Bofa Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Alexander Fenkell, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Jefferies, LLC, David Katzman, Jordan Katzman, Steven Katzman, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Susan Greenspon Rammelt, Richard Schnall, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Stifel, UBS Securities, LLC, Kyle Wailes, William Blair & Company, LLC of Related Cases (Riley, Steven)
December 16, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE by Granite Point Capital 8 Dragons China Opportunities Fund, Granite Point Capital Master Fund, LP, Granite Point Capital Scorpion Focused Ideas Fund, and Granite Point Capital Panacea Global Healthcare re #24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Notice of Non-Opposition of Granite Point to Competing Motions for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. (Spragens, John)
December 16, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#57 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (am)
December 13, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by Camelot Event Driven Fund, Joe Stofko of Non-Opposition to Appointment of Lead Plaintiff (Swafford, Tara)
December 13, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by MICHAEL J MORSE re #27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to appoint Lead Plaintiff Notice of Withdrawal of Intervening Plaintiff's Motion #27 (Bramlett, Paul)
December 9, 2019 Filing 55 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by William Blair & Company, LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 54 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UBS Securities, LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 53 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stifel. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 52 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Loop Capital Markets, LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 51 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 50 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jefferies, LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 49 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Guggenheim Securities, LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 48 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 47 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 46 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bofa Securities, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
December 6, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [44,45]: The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (am)
December 6, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for attorney Phillip Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3044986) by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Holifield, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for attorney Laurence M. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3044979) by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Holifield, James)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Michael Albert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/6/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Danielle S. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/6/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Darren J. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/6/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 5, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei re #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel For Lead Plaintiff and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei, #23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel For Lead Plaintiff and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum in Support filed by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei. (Holifield, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for attorney Michael Albert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3044391) by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Michael Albert in Support)(Wood, Christopher)
December 5, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for attorney Danielle S. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3044389) by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Danielle S. Myers in Support)(Wood, Christopher)
December 5, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for attorney Darren J. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3044386) by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Darren J. Robbins in Support)(Wood, Christopher)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Motions are hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley (as the magistrate judge assigned to the lowest-numbered of the three cases) for consideration and a hearing, if necessary. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/4/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 3, 2019 Filing 35 CORRECT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MICHAEL J MORSE re #27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to appoint Lead Plaintiff (Bramlett, Paul) Modified Text on 12/4/2019 (am).
December 3, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Darren J. Robbins, Danielle S. Myers, Michael Albert, Jeremy A. Lieberman, Phillip Kim, J. Alexander Hood, II, Laurence M. Rosen, Lewis S. Kahn, Melinda A. Nicholson, Michael J. Palestina: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/24/2019. (am)
December 3, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (TN) Tara L. Swafford, (LA) Lewis S. Kahn, (LA) Melinda A. Nicholson, (LA) Michael J. Palestina. (am)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [22,23]: Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (am)
December 3, 2019 CA State Bar status verified as active for Darren J. Robbins, Danielle S. Myers, Michael Albert. (am)
December 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher M. Wood, John Tate Spragens, Paul Kent Bramlett. (am)
December 3, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (TN) James A. Holifield, Jr, (NY)Jeremy A. Lieberman, (NY) Phillip Kim, (NY) J. Alexander Hood, II, (NY) Laurence M. Rosen. (am)
December 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John Tate Spragens on behalf of Granite Point Capital 8 Dragons China Opportunities Fund, Granite Point Capital Master Fund, LP, Granite Point Capital Scorpion Focused Ideas Fund, and Granite Point Capital Panacea Global Healthcare (Spragens, John)
December 2, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Wood in Support filed by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund re: #31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10/2/19 Notice, #2 Exhibit B - 10/24/19 Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit D - Estimate of losses)(Wood, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 32 BRIEF filed by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund re #31 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Wood, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wood on behalf of 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund (Wood, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Joe Stofko, Camelot Event Driven Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint and Consolidate, #2 Attachment Declaration of Tara Swafford, #3 Exhibit A to Decl. - Notice of Pendency, #4 Exhibit B to Decl. - Signed PSLRA Cert., #5 Exhibit C to Decl. - Table of Losses, #6 Exhibit D to Decl. - Firm Resume, #7 Attachment Proposed Order)(Swafford, Tara)
December 2, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of #27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by MICHAEL J MORSE . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Paul Kent Bramlett, #2 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Certification, #3 Exhibit B-Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit C-Business Wire Notice, #5 Exhibit D-Kahn firm resume, #6 Exhibit E-Bramlett firm resume, #7 Attachment Certificate of Service, #8 Attachment Proposed Order)(Bramlett, Paul)
December 2, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to appoint Lead Plaintiff by MICHAEL J MORSE. (Bramlett, Paul)
December 2, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of John Spragens filed by Granite Point Capital 8 Dragons China Opportunities Fund, Granite Point Capital Master Fund, LP, Granite Point Capital Scorpion Focused Ideas Fund, and Granite Point Capital Panacea Global Healthcare re: #24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, #3 Exhibit C - Notice - Andre Action, #4 Exhibit D - Notice - Ginsberg Action, #5 Exhibit E - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume)(Spragens, John)
December 2, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of #24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Granite Point Capital 8 Dragons China Opportunities Fund, Granite Point Capital Master Fund, LP, Granite Point Capital Scorpion Focused Ideas Fund, and Granite Point Capital Panacea Global Healthcare . And for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. (Spragens, John)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Granite Point Capital 8 Dragons China Opportunities Fund, Granite Point Capital Master Fund, LP, Granite Point Capital Scorpion Focused Ideas Fund, and Granite Point Capital Panacea Global Healthcare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Spragens, John)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel For Lead Plaintiff and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum in Support by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Jeremy A. Lieberman, #2 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Certification and Schedule A, #4 Exhibit C - Damages Analysis, #5 Exhibit D - Pomerantz Resume, #6 Exhibit E - Rosen Resume, #7 Exhibit F - Holifield Resume)(Holifield, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel For Lead Plaintiff and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Holifield, James)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Sharon L. Nelles, Andrew J. Finn, and Inbar R. Gal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 25, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Sharon L. Nelles, Andrew J. Finn, Inbar R. Gal. (am)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Inbar R. Gal filed by Bofa Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Jefferies, LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Stifel, UBS Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC re: #16 MOTION for attorney Sharon L. Nelles, Andrew J. Finn, and Inbar R. Gal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3036505). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Finn filed by Bofa Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Jefferies, LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Stifel, UBS Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC re: #16 MOTION for attorney Sharon L. Nelles, Andrew J. Finn, and Inbar R. Gal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3036505). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Sharon L. Nelles filed by Bofa Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Jefferies, LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Stifel, William Blair & Company, LLC re: #16 MOTION for attorney Sharon L. Nelles, Andrew J. Finn, and Inbar R. Gal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3036505). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Sharon L. Nelles, Andrew J. Finn, and Inbar R. Gal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3036505) by Bofa Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Jefferies, LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Stifel, UBS Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC. (Riley, Steven)
November 20, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff, Michael C. Griffin. (am)
November 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Steven Allen Riley, Elizabeth O. Gonser. (am)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Michael C. Griffin filed by Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Jordan Katzman, Steven Katzman, Susan Greenspon Rammelt, Richard Schnall, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes re: #12 MOTION for attorney Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3032634). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Scott D. Musoff filed by Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Jordan Katzman, Steven Katzman, Susan Greenspon Rammelt, Richard Schnall, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes re: #12 MOTION for attorney Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3032634). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jay B. Kasner filed by Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Jordan Katzman, Steven Katzman, Susan Greenspon Rammelt, Richard Schnall, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes re: #12 MOTION for attorney Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3032634). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3032634) by Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Jordan Katzman, Steven Katzman, Susan Greenspon Rammelt, Richard Schnall, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes. (Riley, Steven)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth O. Gonser on behalf of All Defendants (Gonser, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Allen Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Steven)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for James M. Ficaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Christopher L. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney James M. Ficaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3030621) by Adam Franchi. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing-Ficaro)(Cowan, Wade)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Christopher L. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3030608) by Adam Franchi. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing-Nelson)(Cowan, Wade)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/30/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Christopher Nelson, James M. Ficaro, Richard A. Maniskas: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/20/2019. (am)
October 30, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (TN) Wade B. Cowan, (PA)Christopher Nelson, (PA) James M. Ficaro, (PA)Richard A. Maniskas. (am)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bofa Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Alexander Fenkell, Guggenheim Securities, LL, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Jefferies, LLC, David Katzman, Jordan Katzman, Steven Katzman, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Susan Greenspon Rammelt, Richard Schnall, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Stifel, UBS Securities, LLC, Kyle Wailes, William Blair & Company, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3021219), filed by Adam Franch. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franch v. SmileDirectClub, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Inbar R. Gal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Andrew J. Finn
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Wailes
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Greenspon Rammelt
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Katzman
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guggenheim Securities, LL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Inbar R. Gal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Andrew J. Finn
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Inbar R. Gal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Andrew J. Finn
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Inbar R. Gal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Andrew J. Finn
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Inbar R. Gal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Andrew J. Finn
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmileDirectClub, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Katzman
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Fenkell
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Inbar R. Gal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Andrew J. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Inbar R. Gal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Andrew J. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schnall
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bofa Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Inbar R. Gal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Andrew J. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Katzman
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Michael C. Griffin
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guggenheim Securities, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Inbar R. Gal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Andrew J. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Franch
Represented By: Christopher Nelson
Represented By: James M. Ficaro
Represented By: Wade B. Cowan
Represented By: Richard A. Maniskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Franchi
Represented By: James M. Ficaro
Represented By: Wade B. Cowan
Represented By: Richard A. Maniskas
Represented By: Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: TRUSTEE MICHAEL J MORSE
Represented By: Paul Kent Bramlett
Represented By: Michael J. Palestina
Represented By: Lewis S. Kahn
Represented By: Melinda A. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund
Represented By: Christopher M. Wood
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Represented By: Michael Albert
Represented By: Danielle S. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Derus
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: James A. Holifield, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wei Wei
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Represented By: James A. Holifield, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joe Stofko
Represented By: Tara L. Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Camelot Event Driven Fund
Represented By: Tara L. Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Granite Point Capital 8 Dragons China Opportunities Fund, Granite Point Capital Master Fund, LP, Granite Point Capital Scorpion Focused Ideas Fund, and Granite Point Capital Panacea Global Healthcare
Represented By: John Tate Spragens
Represented By: Christopher J. Keller
Represented By: David J. Schwartz
Represented By: Eric J. Belfi
Represented By: Francis P. McConville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?