Dollar General Corporation v. General Reinsurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dollar General Corporation
Defendant: General Reinsurance Corporation, Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2019cv00980
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JOINT filed by Dollar General Corporation. (Glover, Molly)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/11/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/11/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIPT #34675057227 in the amount of $200 re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Eggert, #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Toto. (jw)
December 5, 2019 VA State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin C. Eggert and Karen Lynn Toto. (jm)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendant Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation has filed a Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. #10 ), to which no timely response has been filed. The court therefore views this Motion as unopposed and it is hereby GRANTED. Defendant Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation is hereby DISMISSED from this case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/25/2019. (jm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation . (Spicer, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation. (Spicer, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by General Reinsurance Corporation.(Spicer, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by General Reinsurance Corporation, Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing - Toto)(Spicer, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by General Reinsurance Corporation, Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing - Eggert)(Spicer, Richard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 03:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
November 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Molly A. Glover and Richard E. Spicer. (jm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Reinsurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Additional information)(Spicer, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Additional information)(Spicer, Richard)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Reinsurance Corporation, Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation from Circuit Court of Davidson County, case number 19C2331. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3024148) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint)(jm) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/13/2019) (jm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/13/2019) (jm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/13/2019) (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dollar General Corporation v. General Reinsurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Reinsurance Corporation
Represented By: Richard E. Spicer
Represented By: Karen Lynn Toto
Represented By: Benjamin C. Eggert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Management and Insurance Services Corporation
Represented By: Richard E. Spicer
Represented By: Karen Lynn Toto
Represented By: Benjamin C. Eggert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dollar General Corporation
Represented By: Molly A. Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?