I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC v. ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC et al
Plaintiff: I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC
Defendant: Brian MacIntosh and ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00981
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 1, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher E. Thorsen. (jw)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/20/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order (Stipulated) by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Stipulated Order)(Thorsen, Christopher)
December 20, 2019 Filing 37 Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC.. (McLaurin, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Filing 36 Witness List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (McLaurin, Charles)
December 17, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Thorsen on behalf of I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC (Thorsen, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The preliminary injunction hearing in this case is scheduled for December 23, 2019 beginning at 8:15 a.m. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/3/2019. (jm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC re #29 Order,,, #31 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing & Extend TRO, #32 Order,, Terminate Hearings, of Parties Agreement to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing to December 23, 2019 (Longnecker, Joy)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #4 ) originally set for December 3, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELED. Defendants are DIRECTED to inform the Court by noon on Tuesday, December 3, 2019 whether they have any objection to holding the hearing on December 23, 2019. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/2/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing & Extend TRO by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Longnecker, Joy) Modified on 12/3/2019 (jm).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Robert B. Newkirk, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice, due to failure to timely pay fee and to timely provide certificate of good standing from a federal court. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/2/19. (Davies, Kirk) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (hb).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: A hearing to consider the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for December 3, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Absent extraordinary circumstances, the hearing will conclude at 5:00 p.m. on that day. The parties shall file with the Court by noon on Monday, December 2, 2019, the following pertaining to the preliminary injunction hearing: (1) any affidavits; (2) witness lists; (3) exhibit lists; and (4) any stipulations. No witness shall testify live at the preliminary injunction hearing unless the party calling such witness to testify has identified that witness prior to the hearing. The Court intends to ensure time is allocated equitably; the parties are encouraged to consult with each other prior to the hearing to facilitate the same. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 28 REDACTION to #27 Redacted Document,, Declaration of Matthew Bodnar by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Emails and termination offer letters, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Email and termination offer letter to Juice Kings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Jan 4, 2019 email, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Jan, 2019 email, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Feb 2019 emails, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Emails and amended Agreement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Mar 7, 2019 email and Juice Kings amended agreement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Sep 18, 2019 email and amended termination letter agreement)(Longnecker, Joy)
November 25, 2019 Filing 27 REDACTION to #15 Sealed Document,, Declaration of Matthew Bodnar by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 (***EXHIBIT A FILED IN ERROR - CORRECTED VERSION FILED AT DE #28 ***) Exhibit A - Emails and termination offer letters, #2 Exhibit B - Email and termination offer letter to Juice Kings, #3 Exhibit C - Jan 4, 2019 email, #4 Exhibit D - Jan 7, 2019 email, #5 Exhibit E - Feb 2019 emails, #6 Exhibit F - Emails and ILJB Brawley's amended agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Mar 7 2019 email and Juice Kings amended agreement, #8 Exhibit H - Sep 18, 2019 email and amended terminaton letter agreement)(Longnecker, Joy) Modified on 11/26/2019 (jm).
November 25, 2019 Filing 26 REDACTION to #14 Sealed Document, Reply in Support of Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - QCJ Facebook page, #2 Exhibit 2 - QCJ Instagram account, #3 Exhibit 3 - Text from QCJ, #4 Exhibit 4 - QCJ Google search)(Longnecker, Joy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS returned executed by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. Brian MacIntosh served on 11/16/2019. (Longnecker, Joy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS returned executed by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC served on 11/13/2019. (Longnecker, Joy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 TRO BOND in the amount of $10,000 posted by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment TRO Bond per #20 Order)(jm) Modified on 11/21/2019 (jm).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the Court's November 15, 2019 Memorandum Opinion (Doc. No. #20 ), having posted a bond in the amount of ten thousand dollars ($10,000.00), in a form satisfactory to the Clerk of Court, Plaintiff I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC ("Juice Bar")'s Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED in part as to Plaintiff's request for a Temporary Restraining Order. A hearing as to Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction is scheduled for December 3, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/21/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC re #20 Order,,,, of Posting Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receipt for bond)(Longnecker, Joy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Under the circumstances of this case, the Court finds that the inevitability of harm to Defendants in the event the TRO proves to have been improvidently granted, the likely approximate amount of damages from such harm, the countervailing strength of Plaintiff's case, and the public interest favor the requirement that Plaintiff post a security bond in the amount of $10,000.00. The Court therefore will require Plaintiff to post security in the amount of ten thousand dollars ($10,000.00), in a form satisfactory to the Clerk of Court. Upon notification of the posting of such security, the Court intends to issue immediately a TRO as described, and for the reasons, discussed herein. As to Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction, subject to and subsequent to Plaintiff posting the required security, the Court will set a hearing for a date and time prior to the expiration of the TRO. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/15/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: On November 11, 2019, Plaintiff filed under seal its reply in support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ("Reply"). (Doc. No. #14 ). Plaintiff simultaneously filed a Motion to File Reply Under Seal. (Doc. No. #13 ). On November 13, 2019, the Court granted Plaintiff's Motion to File Reply Under Seal on the condition that it file a redacted copy of the sealed documents on or before two weeks from the date of the Order. (Doc. No. #17 ). In its Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction the Court will quote limited portions of Plaintiff's Reply. The quoted language does not implicate any sensitive or confidential material. Accordingly, the Court UNSEALS those limited portions of the Reply. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/15/2019. (jm)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal provided Plaintiff files a redacted copy of Doc. Nos. #14 and #15 and their attachments on or before two weeks from the date of this Order. From the face of the sealed filing, it is clear that the legitimate interests in favor of sealing outweigh the interests of the public in accessing the document. The Clerk is directed to file Doc. Nos. #14 and #15 and their attachments under seal. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/13/2019. (jm)
November 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to to Exceed Page Limit re #14 Sealed Document, Reply in Support of Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Longnecker, Joy)
November 11, 2019 Filing 15 Sealed Document Declaration of Matthew Bodnar filed by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails and termination offer letters, #2 Exhibit B - Email and termination offer letter to Juice Kings, #3 Exhibit C - Jan 4, 2019 email, #4 Exhibit D - Jan 7, 2019 email, #5 Exhibit E - Feb 2019 emails, #6 Exhibit F - Emails and ILJB Brawley's amended agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Mar 7, 2019 email and Juice Kings amended agreement, #8 Exhibit H - Sep 18, 2019 email and amended termination letter agreement)(Longnecker, Joy)
November 11, 2019 Filing 14 Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - QCJ Facebook page, #2 Exhibit 2 - QCJ Instagram account, #3 Exhibit 3 - Text from QCJ, #4 Exhibit 4 - QCJ Google search)(Longnecker, Joy)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Reply and Declaration) by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Longnecker, Joy)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC, Brian MacIntosh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ryan affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ryan email)(NewKirk, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a reply to Defendants' Response, addressing only matters within the scope of the Response, by Monday, November 11, at 10:00 a.m. (CST). By the same time, Defendants are DIRECTED to file (or explain why they are unable to file) an affidavit or declaration attaching and authenticating Deidre Ryan's "emails [plural]" referenced in the last full sentence of page 4 of the Response. (Page ID # 412) and (if not encompassed among those emails) the "email confirmation" referenced in paragraph 8 of Brian MacIntosh's affidavit (Doc. No. 10-1 at 2 ). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/8/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC, Brian MacIntosh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit MacIntosh)(NewKirk, Robert)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 : The PHV motion must be accompanied by a Certificate of Good Standing from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (dt)
November 7, 2019 NC State Bar status verified as active for Robert B. NewKirk, III. (dt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Robert B. Newkirk, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC and Brian MacIntosh. (dt)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: In response to a request from Defendant, the time for Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #4 ) is EXTENDED to 12:00 p.m. (CST) on Thursday, November 7, 2019. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/7/2019. (jm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
November 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joy Boyd Longnecker and Charles C. McLaurin. (jm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC and Brian MacIntosh. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #4 , the "Motion"). Defendant is DIRECTED to file a response by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, November 6, 2019. Plaintiff's counsel has certified that a copy of the Motion was served upon Defendants' counsel on November 4, 2019, but no counsel for Defendants has filed a notice of appearance in this action. Accordingly, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order on Defendants' counsel as soon as possible by any available means. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/5/2019. (jm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreements, #2 Exhibit 2 - Termination offer letters, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defs' attempts to terminate agreements, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Default, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Termination, #6 Exhibit 6 - ILJB and Queen City menus, #7 Exhibit 7 - Post-termination use of ILJB marks, #8 Attachment Proposed order on Motion for TRO)(jm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC, Brian MacIntosh (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3024877), filed by I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreements, #3 Exhibit 2 - Termination offer letters, #4 Exhibit 3 - Defs' attempts to terminate agreements, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Default, #6 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Termination)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC v. ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian MacIntosh
Represented By: Robert B. NewKirk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILJB Charlotte Juice, LLC
Represented By: Robert B. NewKirk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I Love Juice Bar Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Joy Boyd Longnecker
Represented By: Charles C. McLaurin
Represented By: Christopher E. Thorsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?