Burnett et al v. Aighobahi et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Burnett, Michael Jones, Sheneca Burnett, M. J. and Shemeca Burnett
Defendant: Sherry O. Aighobahi and Mercedes Benz, Inc.
Interested Party: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Case Number: 3:2019cv00987
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 by Alicia Burnett. (Clayton, Terry)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 Summons issued as to Sherry O. Aighobahi, Liberty Mutual Insurance, and Mercedes Benz, Inc. Service copies given to counsel at Intake. (mg)
December 24, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alicia Burnett.(Clayton, Terry)
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Alicia Burnett as to Sherry O. Aighobahi. (Clayton, Terry)
December 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Alicia Burnett. Mercedes Benz, Inc. served on 11/22/2019. (Clayton, Terry)
December 18, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jenna D. Barbe. (mg)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna D. Barbe on behalf of Sherry O. Aighobahi (Barbe, Jenna)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is off to an auspicious start. The complaint filed on November 5, 2019 (Docket No. #1 ) did not comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 because it contained the full name of the minor plaintiff. This necessitated an order by the Court directing that the complaint and summons be sealed, and that Plaintiffs refile the complaint in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2. (Docket No. #8 .) The initial case management conference is therefore RESCHEDULED for 2:30 p.m, February 11, 2020. Additionally, Plaintiffs must also comply with the Court's prior order for refiling their complaint and summons in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and must do so by no later than December 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/3/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the Complaint, #1 , and the summons, #4 , #5 , be placed under seal. Within 5 days of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall refile their Complaint and any attachments, as well as new summons for Defendants, that redacts all personal information related to the minor M.J. The parties are cautioned about any future filings not having this information redacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/12/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/8/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Mercedes Benz, Inc. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Sherry O. Aighobahi. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
November 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Terry R. Clayton. (mg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sherry O. Aighobahi, Mercedes Benz, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3025790), filed by Sheneca Burnett, Alicia Burnett, M.J. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) Modified text on 11/12/2019 (gb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett et al v. Aighobahi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Burnett
Represented By: Terry R. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Terry R. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheneca Burnett
Represented By: Terry R. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. J.
Represented By: Terry R. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shemeca Burnett
Represented By: Terry R. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry O. Aighobahi
Represented By: Jenna D. Barbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Benz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?