BiotronX, LLC et al v. Tech One Biomedical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott Stevenson and Biotronx, LLC
Defendant: Matthew Mincer and Tech One Biomedical, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01035
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #15 Amended Complaint For Extension of Time to Respond by Matthew Mincer, Tech One Biomedical, LLC. (Presnell, E.)
December 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference in this matter is continued and reset for February 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/23/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew Mincer and Tech One Biomedical, LLC, filed by Scott Stevenson and BiotronX, LLC.(dt) Modified on 12/26/2019 (dt).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Docket No. #10 ) is GRANTED. In light of the Amended Complaint, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. #7 ) is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/23/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference re #4 Notice of Case Management Conference by Biotronx, LLC, Scott Stevenson. (Prince, Raymond)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION (JOINT) by Matthew Mincer, Tech One Biomedical, LLC. (Presnell, E.)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Biotronx, LLC, Scott Stevenson Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint. (Prince, Raymond)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint by Biotronx, LLC, Scott Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Amended Complaint)(Prince, Raymond)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Response and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Biotronx, LLC, Scott Stevenson. (Prince, Raymond)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Matthew Mincer, Tech One Biomedical, LLC . (Presnell, E.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Matthew Mincer, Tech One Biomedical, LLC. (Presnell, E.)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tech One Biomedical, LLC. (Presnell, E.)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
November 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Raymond G. Prince, James L. Smith, E. Todd Presnell, and Kristina A. Reliford. (jm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Mincer and Tech One Biomedical, LLC from Circuit Court for Sumner County, Tennessee, case number 83CC1-2019-CV-923. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3034262) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File, #3 Exhibit B - Business Entity Detail) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BiotronX, LLC et al v. Tech One Biomedical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mincer
Represented By: Kristina A. Reliford
Represented By: E. Todd Presnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tech One Biomedical, LLC
Represented By: Kristina A. Reliford
Represented By: E. Todd Presnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Stevenson
Represented By: Raymond G. Prince
Represented By: James L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biotronx, LLC
Represented By: Raymond G. Prince
Represented By: James L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?