Western Crane Service, Inc. v. Wiz Tech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Western Crane Service, Inc.
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and Wiz Tech, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01043
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Caputo, Christopher)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Western Crane Service, Inc.. Wiz Tech, Inc. served on 1/2/2020. (Pippenger, M.)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Western Crane Service, Inc.. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 11/22/2019. (Pippenger, M.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Western Crane Service, Inc.. (Pippenger, M.)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/21/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
November 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel H. Puryear, M. Andrew Pippenger. (am)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Wiz Tech, Inc. (Service packets to be picked up at the front counter.) (am)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Wiz Tech, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3035901), filed by Western Crane Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Crane Service, Inc. v. Wiz Tech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Crane Service, Inc.
Represented By: M. Andrew Pippenger
Represented By: Daniel H. Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Caputo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiz Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?