United States of America v. $33,640 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $33,640 United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv01046
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by United States of America. $33,640 United States Currency served on 1/7/2020. WARRANT Returned Executed as to United States of America. (mg) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/10/2020) (mg).
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 CORRECTED Summons and Warrant for Arrest in Rem on Defendant Property issued by Clerk. (jw) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/2/2019) (jw).
November 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Debra Teufel Phillips, James Matthew Blackburn. (jw)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 ***CORRECTED AT DE #4*** Summons and Warrant for Arrest in Rem on Defendant Property issued by Clerk. (jw) Modified on 11/25/2019 (jw).
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States of America. (jw) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/25/2019) (jw).
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $33,640 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Timothy M. Szymanski)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $33,640 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,640 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Matthew Blackburn
Represented By: Debra Teufel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?