Quasem v. Pervacio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Monirul Quasem
Defendant: Pervacio, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01050
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference set for January 22, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. is hereby reset for March 5, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue January 22, 2020, Initial Case Management Conference by Monirul Quasem. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit re: Dec. 14, 2019 Service)(Bigelow, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/2/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Pervacio, Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
November 25, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Charles Bigelow. (jm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pervacio, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3037627), filed by Monirul Quasem. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quasem v. Pervacio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monirul Quasem
Represented By: Robert Charles Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pervacio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?