Thompson v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Plaintiff: Anton Thompson
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation and Karen Ferguson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01071
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE "Bivens Claim Filed" by Anton Thompson (mg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Additional Documents by Anton Thompson. (jw)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself in this matter. The file shall be returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (Note: Case randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr by the Clerk's Office for all further proceedings). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/23/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On December 23, 2019, Plaintiff faxed the attached documents to the Court's chambers. Plaintiff is directed to make all future filings with the Clerk's Office. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Miscellaneous Filing)(xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The undersigned has referred this matter to the Magistrate Judge for the purposes set forth in its Order of December 17, 2020 (Doc. No. 7). The Court takes note of the fact that Plaintiff's action is a Bivens action, (Doc. No. 1 at 3, 7), not an action under 42 U.S.C. 1983, and the Court will proceed accordingly. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/20/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/17/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Additional Filings by Anton Thompson re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Miscellaneous Attachment I, #2 Attachment - Miscellaneous Attachment II, #3 Attachment - Miscellaneous Attachment III, #4 Exhibit B2 - Mind Control with Electromagnetic Frequency, #5 Exhibit F2- Memorandum, August 7, 1979, #6 Exhibit G2 - Orgins and Techniques of Monarch Mind Control)(mg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anton Thompson. (mg)
December 2, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation and Karen Ferguson. (Service copies returned to pro se plaintiff at intake.) (jm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) Modified on 12/2/2019 (jm).
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation and Karen Ferguson, filed by Anton Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supporting Documentation, #2 Exhibit B - Supporting Documentation, #3 Exhibit C - Supporting Documentation, #4 Exhibit C-1 - Supporting Documentation, #5 Exhibit D - Supporting Documentation, #6 Exhibit E - Supporting Documentation, #7 Exhibit E-2 - Supporting Documentation, #8 Exhibit F - Supporting Documentation, #9 Exhibit G - Supporting Documentation, #10 Exhibit H - Supporting Documentation, #11 Exhibit 1 - Suporting Documentation, #12 Exhibit 2 - Supporting Documentation, #13 Exhibit 3 - Supporting Documentation, #14 Exhibit 4 - Supporting Documentation, #15 Exhibit 5 - Supporting Documentation, #16 Exhibit 6 - Supporting Documentation, #17 Exhibit 7 - Supporting Documentation)(jm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2019: #18 Attachment Filing Fee Receipt) (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?