El et al v. Metro Nashville Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Zariya Izabella Shye El and Darryl Orlando Jackson El
Defendant: Dt. Clouza/Plouza, Jed Baldoni, Ryan Cagle and Metro Nashville Police Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv01091
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to Amend by Darryl Orlando Jackson El and Zariya Izabella Shye El (vh)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: As to the civil claims asserted in Plaintiffs' initial filing, this action is STAYED. The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case and maintain the physical file until further order. Plaintiffs MUST file a status report informing the Court of the status of their pending state criminal proceedings within 6 MONTHS from the date this Order is entered on the docket, and every 6 months thereafter until the state criminal proceedings are resolved. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/10/2019. (xc:Pro se parties by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing re Claim/Civil Case by Darryl Orlando Jackson El, Zariya Izabella Shye El. (gb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Writ of Prohibito by Darryl Orlando Jackson El, Zariya Izabella Shye El. (gb)
December 15, 2019 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet and certificate of service form included. (jw)
December 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Darryl Orlando Jackson El, Zariya Izabella Shye El. (jw)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jed Baldoni, Ryan Cagle, Dt. Clouza/Plouza, Metro Nashville Police Department, filed by Zariya Izabella Shye El, Darryl Orlando Jackson El. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El et al v. Metro Nashville Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dt. Clouza/Plouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed Baldoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Nashville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zariya Izabella Shye El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Orlando Jackson El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?