Silcox v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Janet L. Silcox
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2019cv01105
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Meredith E. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/17/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
December 16, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Hudson Taylor Ellis. IL State Bar status verified as active for Meredith Marcus. (dt)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/12/2019. (mg)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Meredith E. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3049197) by Janet L. Silcox. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Marcus, Meredith)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Hudson Taylor Ellis on behalf of Janet L. Silcox (Ellis, Hudson)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3047591), filed by Janet L. Silcox. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silcox v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L. Silcox
Represented By: Meredith Marcus
Represented By: Hudson Taylor Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?