Booth v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Adam Booth
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01114
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Nissan North America, Inc..(Graham, Stanley)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/30/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nissan North America, Inc. answer due 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/19/19. (dt)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Graham, Stanley)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
December 16, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Constance A. Mann, Stanley E. Graham and Caraline E. Rickard. (dt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (dt)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nissan North America, Inc. from Rutherford County Circuit Court, case number 76313. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-3049380) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to State Court of Filing of Removal, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booth v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Adam Booth
Represented By: Constance A. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Stanley E. Graham
Represented By: Caraline E. Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?