Ethridge v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Wendell Ethridge
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01125
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 6/29/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2021 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 6/22/2021. Witness List due by 6/22/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/22/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/11/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 11, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Curt M. Masker. (dt)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 8/14/2020. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/10/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/10/2020. Joint Mediation Report due by 10/9/2020. (Hearing lasted :10) (ds)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Curt M. Masker on behalf of Wendell Ethridge (Masker, Curt)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JOINT) filed by Wendell Ethridge. (Street, Jonathan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Carpenter, Brigid)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Carpenter, Brigid)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Carpenter, Brigid)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Wendell Ethridge. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Signed Return Receipt)(Street, Jonathan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
December 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan A. Street. (dt)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3051008), filed by Wendell Ethridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated 10/8/2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter dated 11/1/2019, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethridge v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Ethridge
Represented By: Jonathan A. Street
Represented By: Curt M. Masker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?